Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Augustine, Benson, Ellis, Griffith, Hayes, Kelley, Patterson, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Office of Personnel Services and Benefits within the Department of Budget and Management to study the number and salaries of certain employees employed by certain State agencies in a position of grade 19 or above who are African American, Hispanic, or any other racial minority and report its findings to the Governor and a certain committee of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2019, and June 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2019
Legislative Date
3/08/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2019
Legislative Date
3/15/2019
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 Referred Senate Rules 42
Senate 3/08/2019 3/08/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Office of Personnel Services and Benefits - Study of Diversity of Employees in State Agencies
Senate 3/14/2019 3/15/2019 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/15/2019 3/15/2019 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM