Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Building Performance Standards - Energy Codes - Local Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Glassman
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a local jurisdiction to adopt amendments to the Maryland Building Performance Standards that are equivalent to the requirements of specified international energy conservation and energy efficiency codes.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {503922/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2014 2/27/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Glassman) {503922/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-504 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM