Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Baltimore County Hub and Spoke Pilot Program to offer and provide addiction treatment on demand through a model that offers ongoing opioid use disorder treatment integrated with general health and wellness services; requiring the Baltimore County Department of Health, in consultation with the Behavioral Health Administration in the Maryland Department of Health and certain stakeholders, to develop and implement the Program in a certain manner; requiring a report on the Pilot Program's results by October 1, 2023: etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0611
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2020
Legislative Date
2/21/2020
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/18/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {397574/1 Adopted
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2020 2/21/2020 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/16 at 10:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/18/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Favorable with Amendments {397574/1 Adopted 53A
Senate 3/18/2020 3/14/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53A
Text - Third - Baltimore County - Behavioral Health - Hub and Spoke Pilot Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-4101 through 13-4105 )
Last Updated: 6/9/2020 5:22 PM