Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senator Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Youth Wellness Leadership Pilot Program in the State Department of Education; requiring the Department, after consultation with the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, to implement the Program for a specified number of students in public high school in Prince George's County and a specified number of students in public high school in one other county; authorizing the State Department of Education to collaborate with specified local community organizations; specifying the purpose of the Program; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-415.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM