Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Montgomery County and Prince George's County Fair Share Act of 2014
Sponsored by
Senator Colburn
Status
In the Senate - Hearing cancelled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission each year to impose on specified ratepayers a sewage and sludge remediation charge; requiring the Montgomery County Council and the Prince George's County Council to meet each year to determine the amount of the sewage and sludge remediation charge; requiring the county councils to consider specified anticipated costs when determining the amount of the sewage and sludge remediation charge; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2014
Legislative Date
2/21/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2014 2/21/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/18/2014 Hearing cancelled
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 25-107, 25-108 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM