Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Sponsored by
Senator Pinsky
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that certain authority of railroad companies to acquire property by condemnation does not apply to an entity that owns or operates a railroad powered by a magnetic levitation propulsion system, or passenger or freight transportation for which pressurized capsules or pods travel at high speed in reduced-pressure tubes.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0548
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Railroad Companies - Condemnation Authority - Application
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-405 through 5-408, 5-409 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM