Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the Worcester County Board of License Commissioners to issue a Class D beer, wine and liquor license within the corporate limits of the Town of Berlin or the corporate limits of the Town of Snow Hill.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2014
Legislative Date
2/24/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {924738/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {793121/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-0)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2014 2/24/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/06 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 3/06/2014 3/07/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/18/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {924738/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Mathias) {793121/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/27/2014 3/27/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 64
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-0) 67
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM
Click to return on the top page