Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Simonaire
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Department of Natural Resources, in addition to specified other applicable penalties, to suspend for up to a period of 1 year the privilege to operate a vessel on the waters of the State of a person who is convicted of operating a vessel on waters of the State while under the influence of alcohol; making the Act contingent upon the State of Maryland entering into the Interstate Boating Violator Compact on or before October 1, 2020; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 2 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2017
Legislative Date
2/22/2017
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {894230/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Reassigned to Judiciary
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/22/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Senate 2/21/2017 2/22/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2017 2/22/2017 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {894230/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - State Boat Act - Privilege to Operate a Vessel - Suspension Authority
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 52
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Reassigned to Judiciary 53
House 3/22/2017 3/22/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
House 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/30/2017 3/30/2017 Hearing canceled
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 3/31/2017 3/31/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM