Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit Review
Sponsored by
Senators Ferguson, Conway, Nathan-Pulliam, and Robinson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Restore Trust in Policing to review the operation of the Baltimore Police Department's Gun Trace Task Force and make recommendations on the reorganization of the Police Department and certain other matters as necessary; authorizing the Commission to conduct hearings, administer oaths, issue process to compel a witness to appear, and require a person to testify; requiring the Commission to submit a final report of its findings by December 31, 2019, to the Governor and the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0561
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {214436/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Rereferred to Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Hearing 4/06 at 3:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Office of Legislative Audits - Audits of the Baltimore City Police Department
Senate 2/15/2018 2/16/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 4/04/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {214436/1 Adopted 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61
Text - Third - Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit Review
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 62
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61A
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Rereferred to Appropriations
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Hearing 4/06 at 3:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 753
Text - Chapter - Baltimore City Police Department – Commission to Restore Trust in Policing and Audit Review
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM