Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish the Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program on or before July 1, 2019, for administration of a voluntary certificate program for ethical special education advocates; specifying qualifications and application procedures for a certificate; requiring the Department to issue a certificate to a certain applicant; authorizing an applicant to petition for judicial review of a decision of the Department that relates to issuing or renewing a certificate; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0966
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education – Voluntary Ethical Special Education Advocate Certificate Program
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-420 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM