Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Mathias, Oaks, Reilly, and Rosapepe
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene to make an advance payment to a nursing home at the request of the nursing home under specified circumstances; providing that the advance payment may not exceed 50% of the estimated amount due for the uncompensated services; requiring the Department to pay the balance due to a nursing home under specified circumstances; requiring a specified report regarding eligibility applications be submitted to specified committees of the General Assembly by December 31, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1599
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0939 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2017
Legislative Date
2/20/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {287370/1 Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/20/2017 2/20/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments {287370/1 Adopted 59
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 59
Text - Third - Nursing Homes - Partial Payment for Services Provided
Senate 4/06/2017 3/31/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/06/2017 3/30/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 64
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Hearing 4/10 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-101, 15-149 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM