Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Population Restrictions on Class A Licenses
Sponsored by
Senator Robey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Board of License Commissioners of Howard County from issuing more than one Class A license of any type for every 4,000 residents of the county as determined by the latest federal census; and providing the Act does not apply to a license issued for use in an existing shopping center or in a proposed shopping center development for which a building permit has been issued that contains 200,000 or more square feet of commercial retail space.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Robey) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-4)
Proceedings
69
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Robey) Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Referred Senate Rules 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/20/2014 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/19/2014 3/19/2014 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2014 4/04/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 60
Senate 4/04/2014 3/26/2014 Second Reading Passed 60
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 66
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 68
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 Second Reading Passed 68
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Third Reading Passed (132-4) 69
Senate 4/07/2014 3/31/2014 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 377
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM