Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsored by
Senators Mathias, Brochin, Kelley, Lee, Ramirez, Smith, and Zirkin
Status
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "offshore drilling activity" to mean the exploration, development, or production of oil or gas in, on, or under the outer continental shelf and the transportation of oil or gas from the outer continental shelf; establishing that an offshore drilling activity is an ultrahazardous and abnormally dangerous activity; establishing that a person that causes a spill of oil or gas while engaged in an offshore drilling activity is strictly liable for certain damages; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1456
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2018
Legislative Date
3/01/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498177/1
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Edwards) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {498177/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Judiciary Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
4/07/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {562214/1 Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {473323/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-93)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (117-23)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2018
Legislative Date
5/25/2018
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Governor's Veto Letter
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/01/2018 3/01/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {498177/1 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Edwards) Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {498177/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Judiciary Environment and Transportation 50
House 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2018 4/07/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Favorable with Amendments {562214/1 Adopted 64
House 4/07/2018 3/30/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 64
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Floor Amendment {473323/1 (Delegate Krebs) Rejected (47-93) 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (117-23) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 66
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Post Passage 5/25/2018 5/25/2018 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Governor's Veto Letter
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-301.1, 3-2101 through 3-2104 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM