Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Oaks
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from committing an assault by intentionally strangling, suffocating, or impeding the normal breathing or circulation of blood of another by applying pressure to the other person's throat or neck or by blocking the other person's nose or mouth; providing that a person who violates the Act is guilty of assault in the first degree; and providing penalties of up to 25 years of imprisonment for a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1371 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - Penalties
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Law - Assault by Strangulation or Suffocation - Penalties
Senate 2/28/2017 3/01/2017 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-202 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM