Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Sponsored by
Senator Reilly
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Exempting a high-deductible health plan from the prohibition on application of a deductible to coverage for male sterilization; and applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans issued, delivered, or renewed in the State on or after January 1, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2017
Legislative Date
2/27/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/27/2017 2/27/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Health Insurance - Coverage for Male Sterilization - High-Deductible Health Plans
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-826.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM