Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a prohibition in Baltimore County against hunting or attempting to hunt nongame birds and mammals without first obtaining a hunting license.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1699
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2018
Legislative Date
2/23/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2018
Legislative Date
2/26/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Baltimore County - Hunting - Nongame Birds and Mammals
Senate 2/23/2018 2/23/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2018 2/26/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM