Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the age of an individual to whom a pharmacist may administer an influenza vaccination from at least 9 years old to at least 5 years old.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Pharmacists - Administration of the Influenza Vaccination - Age Requirement
Senate 3/16/2017 3/17/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing canceled
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM