Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
Sponsored by
Senators Jennings and Norman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Repealing in Harford County a provision of law stating that a condition of a common direct or indirect sharing between specified persons of profit from the sale of alcoholic beverages gives rise to a presumption of indirect ownership interest in an alcoholic beverages license.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Favorable
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {713925/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/08/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2017
Legislative Date
4/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (112-0)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Interest in More Than One License
Senate 3/09/2017 3/10/2017 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Favorable 52
Senate 3/27/2017 3/23/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 52
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Floor Amendment {713925/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 53
Senate 3/28/2017 3/24/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Text - Third - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 54
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 4/08/2017 4/08/2017 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 4/08/2017 4/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 66
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (112-0) 68
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Returned Passed 63A
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 497
Text - Chapter - Harford County - Alcoholic Beverages - Common Direct or Indirect Sharing of Profit
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   22-102, 22-1501, 22-1503 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM