Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that the first $300,000 received by the Waterway Improvement Fund, during fiscal year 2019, may be used only for the State portion of funding for the dredging study of the Ocean City Inlet by the U.S. Army Corps of Engineers; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Mathias) Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {799438/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/29/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/06/2018
Action
Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Stein) Adopted
Proceedings
66
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {283725/1 (Delegate Folden) Rejected (50-87)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/03/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (96-44)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/04/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Mathias) Adopted 43
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Referred Senate Rules 43
Text - First - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/19/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 4/03/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Favorable with Amendments {799438/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2018 3/29/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2018 3/26/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
House 4/06/2018 4/06/2018 Hearing 4/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Favorable Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/01/2018 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate Stein) Adopted 66
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Rey) Adopted 67
House 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Floor Amendment {283725/1 (Delegate Folden) Rejected (50-87) 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Floor Amendment {553326/1 (Delegate Rey) Rejected 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Motion Vote Previous Question (Delegate Bromwell) Adopted 68
House 4/09/2018 4/03/2018 Third Reading Passed (96-44) 68
Senate 4/09/2018 4/04/2018 Returned Passed 66
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 719
Text - Chapter - Waterway Improvement Fund - Ocean City Inlet Dredging Study
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM