Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the fee from $25 to $125 for a county license to sell cigarettes at retail in Charles County; requiring the Clerk of the Circuit Court for Charles County to distribute $25 of each license fee to the Comptroller and to distribute $100 of each license fee to Charles County to be used to enforce existing laws banning the sale or distribution of tobacco or tobacco products to minors; and prohibiting the use of certain funds to supplant certain existing funding for a certain purpose.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1737
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/31/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62A
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
4/01/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Middleton) Adopted 46
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Referred Senate Rules 46
Text - First - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Favorable Adopted 62A
Senate 4/05/2018 3/31/2018 Second Reading Passed 62A
Text - Third - Charles County - Cigarette Retailers - County License Fee
Senate 4/06/2018 4/01/2018 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 62
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 16-302 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:37 PM