Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public-Private Partnerships
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Analysis
Synopsis
Stating the actions the State will take regarding public-private partnerships.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
Referred Senate Rules
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Motion Rules Suspended for late introduction (Senator Muse) Adopted 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 Referred Senate Rules 51
Senate 3/26/2013 3/27/2013 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Documents
Date Posted Document Name
3/22/2013 Text - First - Public-Private Partnerships
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM