Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Sponsored by
Senator Carozza
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Designating July 27, 2019, as Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day; and providing that the designation is an appropriate way for the State to properly thank and honor its members of the United States armed forces for their service and sacrifice during the Korean War.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Carozza) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
4/03/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {504235/1 Adopted
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/28/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
61
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Rules Suspend for Late Introduction (Senator Carozza) Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Motion Rules Suspend to Refer (Senator Carozza) Adopted 54
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 54
Senate 3/22/2019 3/22/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Senate 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 4/03/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Favorable with Amendments {504235/1 Adopted 60
Senate 4/03/2019 3/28/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 60
Text - Third - Welcome Home Korean War Veterans Day
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 61
House 4/04/2019 3/26/2019 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 61
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM