Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Built to Learn Act of 2020
Sponsored by
The Speaker and Delegates McIntosh, Dumais, and M. Jackson
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Requiring or authorizing, under certain circumstances, the Maryland Stadium Authority to contract for, manage, and oversee certain public school facility projects; authorizing the Prince George's County government and Board of Education to enter into a certain public-private partnership to enhance the delivery of public school construction projects in the county; requiring the Governor, beginning in fiscal year 2020, to include in the annual budget certain supplemental funding to be used for certain educational purposes; etc.
Committees
Original:
Appropriations  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0001
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2020, July 1, 2022, July 1, 2026
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
Contingency - on enactment of another bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/02/2019
Legislative Date
10/02/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {294067/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Walker) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (128-6)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2020
Legislative Date
2/17/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2020
Legislative Date
2/18/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179737/1
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {179737/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {513726/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {394265/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Proceedings
52A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
House Concurs Senate Amendments
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (125-9)
Proceedings
51A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/14/2020
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/02/2019 10/02/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Appropriations
Text - First - Built to Learn Act of 2020
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 1/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {294067/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Built to Learn Act of 2020
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Motion Special Order until 2/14 (Delegate Walker) Adopted 27
House 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (128-6) 28
Senate 2/17/2020 2/17/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 29
Senate 2/18/2020 2/18/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {179737/1 47A
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Laid Over (Senator Peters) Adopted 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments {179737/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {513726/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Floor Amendment {394265/1 (Senator Peters) Adopted 52A
Senate 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Third Readings Passed with Amendments (45-0) 52A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 House Concurs Senate Amendments 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Third Reading Passed (125-9) 51A
House 3/17/2020 3/14/2020 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Built to Learn Act of 2020
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text - Chapter - Built to Learn Act of 2020
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-601, 10-618, 10-620, 10-628, 10-634, 10-649, 10-650, 10-658, 10-658.1 )
(   21-207, 4-126, 4-126.1, 4-126.2, 5-206, 5-303, 5-310, 5-313, 5-317, 5-322, 5-324, 5-325 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:30 PM