Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Preservation and Conservation Easements
Sponsored by
Delegate Stein
Status
In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering specified provisions of law concerning a credit against the State income tax for preservation and conservation easements to allow specified persons to claim the credit for an easement conveyed to the Maryland Environmental Trust, the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation, or the Department of Natural Resources under specified circumstances; requiring the Maryland Environmental Trust to report on the effectiveness of the tax credits to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017, etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0615
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
11/20/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/06/2015
Legislative Date
2/06/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 11/20/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Ways and Means
House 2/06/2015 2/06/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-723 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM