Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Sponsored by
Delegate Korman
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Analysis
Synopsis
Removing the Director and Deputy Director of the Maryland Environmental Service from the Board of Directors of the Maryland Environmental Service; requiring the Secretary and the Treasurer of the Service to be selected by the Board from among the Board's members; prohibiting the Board from awarding a severance package under certain circumstances; requiring the Director to appoint a Diversity Officer; requiring the Board, by December 1, 2021, to adopt or readopt certain policies consistent with the provisions of the Act; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0002
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/26/2020
Legislative Date
10/26/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/26/2020 10/26/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Maryland Environmental Service Reform Act of 2021
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:42 PM