Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Mopeds and Motor Scooters - Valid Drivers' Licenses or Permits
Sponsored by
Delegate Beidle
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an individual who is operating a moped or motor scooter on a highway in the State to possess a valid driver's license or a valid moped operator's permit issued to the individual.
Committees
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
10/10/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 10/10/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2013 3/11/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-101, 16-104.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM