Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes
Sponsored by
Delegates Lisanti and Carey
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for the value of any medals awarded by specified committees and the amount of any prize money or honoraria that is received from the United States Olympic Committee that is the result of a performance at specified international sporting events; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Opposite:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
8/19/2016
Legislative Date
8/19/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2017
Legislative Date
3/02/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585860/1
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2017
Legislative Date
3/10/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 8/19/2016 8/19/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic and Paralympic Games Medals and Prizes
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 11:00 a.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 3/02/2017 3/02/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 38
House 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/7 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted 38
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Favorable with Amendments {585860/1 Adopted 41
Text - Third - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes
House 3/10/2017 3/10/2017 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 43
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Referred Budget and Taxation 42
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Adopted 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Second Reading Passed 63A
Senate 4/10/2017 4/04/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 64
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Returned Passed 70
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 501
Text - Chapter - Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Olympic, Paralympic, Special Olympic, and Deaflympic Games Medals and Prizes
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM