Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Vehicle Laws - Multiyear Registration
Sponsored by
Delegate Carr
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that the system of multiyear vehicle registration adopted by the Motor Vehicle Administration include for Class A (passenger) vehicles and Class D (motorcycle) vehicles options for registration for 1- or 2-year periods to be phased in over 5 years on a county-by-county basis; and requiring the Administration to make certain methods of obtaining or renewing a vehicle registration available for registration for 1- and 2-year periods.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/17/2018
Legislative Date
7/17/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Multiyear Registration
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/17/2018 7/17/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Vehicle Laws - Multiyear Registration
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-413 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM