Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
Sponsored by
Delegate D.E. Davis
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Providing that licenses to manufacture, sell, buy, and store cigarettes do not authorize the licensee to manufacture, ship, import, or sell into or within the State a cigarette that has a characterizing flavor; providing that a public statement that cigarettes or other tobacco products have or produce a certain smell or taste is presumptive evidence that they have a characterizing flavor if the statement is made by certain persons: prohibiting the sale of electronic smoking devices by mail or certain other networks; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0233
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/04/2019
Legislative Date
9/04/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2020
Legislative Date
1/16/2020
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {983594/1 Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {993496/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (95-38)
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/15/2020
Action
Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/04/2019 9/04/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Economic Matters and Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
House 1/16/2020 1/16/2020 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/11/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable with Amendments {983594/1 Adopted 45
House 3/11/2020 3/08/2020 Motion Special Order until Next Session (Delegate D.E. Davis) Adopted 45
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {993496/1 Adopted 46
House 3/12/2020 3/09/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Business Regulation – Tobacco Products – Electronic Smoking Devices, Prohibition on Flavoring, and Sales to Military Members
House 3/13/2020 3/10/2020 Third Reading Passed (95-38) 47A
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Referred Finance 48
Senate 3/15/2020 3/15/2020 Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 3/17/2020 12:44 PM