Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Sponsored by
Delegates Clippinger and Queen
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering, from 15 years to 20 years or the equivalent of 20 years considering certain allowances, the time period that inmates sentenced to life imprisonment for a crime committed on or after October 1, 2021, must serve before becoming eligible for parole consideration; repealing certain provisions that provide that inmates serving a term of life imprisonment may be paroled only with the Governor's approval, subject to certain provisions; repealing certain provisions that require certain parole decisions be sent to the Governor; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1219 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/08/2020
Legislative Date
10/08/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/23/2020
Legislative Date
12/23/2020
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/08/2020 10/08/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Judiciary
House 12/23/2020 12/23/2020 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Correctional Services - Parole - Life Imprisonment
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/14/2021 12:35 PM