Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Sponsored by
Delegate Atterbeary
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person who is not a certain licensee may not complete the transfer of a certain rifle or shotgun as transferor or transferee, except under certain circumstances; requiring, before a certain transfer is conducted, the transferor and transferee to both request that the licensee facilitate the transfer; authorizing a transferor to deliver the rifle or shotgun to a licensee, or without appearing in person before the licensee, to allow another person, authorized by the transferor, to deliver the rifle or shotgun; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0208
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0786 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/04/2019
Legislative Date
9/04/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {182311/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/28/2020
Legislative Date
1/28/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-92)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {763024/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-93)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {453922/1 (Delegate Buckel)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Ruled Out Of Order
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Appeal of the decision of the Chair (Delegate Kipke)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Decision of the Chair upheld (96-42)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga)
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/29/2020
Legislative Date
1/29/2020
Action
Motion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted
Proceedings
16
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2020
Legislative Date
1/30/2020
Action
Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
Proceedings
17
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Committee Amendment {512011/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {843724/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {573928/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (45-91)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (47-88)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Floor Amendment {883824/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (44-92)
Proceedings
18
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2020
Legislative Date
1/31/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/04/2020
Legislative Date
2/04/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (87-47)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/04/2019 9/04/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Favorable with Amendments {182311/1 Adopted 15
House 1/28/2020 1/28/2020 Motion Special Order until 1/29 (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 15
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Floor Amendment {393927/1 (Delegate Cox) Rejected (48-92) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Floor Amendment {763024/1 (Delegate Kipke) Rejected (47-93) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Floor Amendment {453922/1 (Delegate Buckel) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Ruled Out Of Order 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Appeal of the decision of the Chair (Delegate Kipke) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Decision of the Chair upheld (96-42) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Floor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga) 16
House 1/29/2020 1/29/2020 Motion Laid Over (Delegate Szeliga) Adopted 16
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Floor Amendment {153420/1 (Delegate Szeliga) Withdrawn 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Floor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz) 17
House 1/30/2020 1/30/2020 Motion Special Order until Later This Session (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted 17
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Amendment {723126/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Committee Amendment {512011/1 Adopted 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Amendment {843724/1 (Delegate Mautz) Withdrawn 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Amendment {573928/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (45-91) 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Amendment {813526/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (47-88) 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Floor Amendment {883824/1 (Delegate Howard) Rejected (44-92) 18
House 1/31/2020 1/31/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Text - Third - Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
House 2/04/2020 2/04/2020 Third Reading Passed (87-47) 20
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Referred Judicial Proceedings 21
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/18/2020 9:46 AM