Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Vaportinis and Similar Devices - Prohibited
Sponsored by
Delegate Barkley
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Expanding the definition of "AWOL machine" to include a Vaportini or any similar device, so as to prohibit a Vaportini or any similar device from being used to inhale alcohol vapor or otherwise introduce alcohol in any form into the human body.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1416 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
9/10/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
40
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2014
Legislative Date
3/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (105-28)
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/07/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
41
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/12/2014
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/23/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 9/10/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Economic Matters
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/03/2014 3/03/2014 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 40
House 3/04/2014 3/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 40
House 3/06/2014 3/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (105-28) 42
Senate 3/07/2014 3/07/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 41
Senate 3/12/2014 3/12/2014 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2014 3/23/2014 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 58
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 63
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 378
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM