Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of General Services - Declaration and Disposal of Excess and Surplus Property - Government House Furnishings
Sponsored by
Delegates Shoemaker, Hammen, Barron, Bromwell, Cullison, Hayes, Hill, Kipke, Krebs, McDonough, McMillan, Miele, Morgan, Morhaim, Oaks, Pena-Melnyk, Pendergrass, Rose, Saab, Sample-Hughes, West, and K. Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that furnishings used in the Government House may be deemed excess personal property or surplus personal property only by the Government House Trust; prohibiting the Secretary of General Services or the Secretary's designee from selling, giving, or otherwise transferring ownership of specified furnishings directly to the Governor or a former Governor unless the Governor or former Governor participates in an auction that is open to the public and in which the furnishing is being sold; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
9/15/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {476480/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {803221/1 Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/02/2016
Legislative Date
3/02/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
38
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2016
Legislative Date
3/08/2016
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/11/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 9/15/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/26/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Favorable with Amendments {476480/1 Report Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Morhaim) {803221/1 Adopted 36
House 3/02/2016 3/02/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 38
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 38
Senate 3/08/2016 3/08/2016 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/11/2016 4/11/2016 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM