Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
Sponsored by
Delegates Barkley, Davis, Brooks, Jameson, Carey, Waldstreicher, Aumann, Glenn, Branch, Robinson, and Lisanti
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing a specified insured to elect to obtain specified enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under a private passenger motor vehicle liability insurance policy; requiring specified insurers to offer an enhanced underinsured motorist coverage under specified circumstances; altering a specified prohibition on the recovery of benefits under specified coverages; applying the Act to each policy of private passenger motor vehicle insurance issued, sold, or delivered in the State on or after July 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Economic Matters  
Opposite:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0403
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1172 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
6/14/2016
Legislative Date
6/14/2016
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/11/2017
Legislative Date
1/11/2017
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/04/2017
Legislative Date
1/04/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2017
Legislative Date
1/17/2017
Action
Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2017
Legislative Date
1/30/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {523491/1 Adopted
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/31/2017
Legislative Date
1/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
15
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/02/2017
Legislative Date
2/02/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (106-28)
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
Referred Finance
Proceedings
17
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2017
Legislative Date
2/16/2017
Action
Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2017
Legislative Date
3/01/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (32-14)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/06/2017
Legislative Date
4/06/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 6/14/2016 6/14/2016 Pre-filed
House 1/11/2017 1/11/2017 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
House 1/04/2017 1/04/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing canceled
House 1/17/2017 1/17/2017 Hearing 1/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
House 1/30/2017 1/30/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {523491/1 Adopted 15
House 1/31/2017 1/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 15
Text - Third - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
House 2/02/2017 2/02/2017 Third Reading Passed (106-28) 17
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 Referred Finance 17
Senate 2/16/2017 2/16/2017 Hearing 2/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2017 3/01/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 34
Senate 3/03/2017 3/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (32-14) 36
House 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Returned Passed 39
Post Passage 4/06/2017 4/06/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 20
Text - Chapter - Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   19-509, 19-509.1, 19-509.2, 19-510, 19-511, 19-511.1, 19-513 )
(   17-103 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM