Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
Sponsored by
Delegates Ebersole, Atterbeary, Attar, Barve, Boyce, Bridges, Cassilly, Ciliberti, Clark, Fraser-Hidalgo, Gilchrist, Harrison, Healey, Holmes, Jacobs, Jalisi, Lafferty, Lehman, Love, Otto, Parrott, Stein, Stewart, Wells, and Wivell
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring commercial driver's license training schools to include training on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking as part of the curriculum; requiring the Motor Vehicle Administration to include content on the recognition, prevention, and effective reporting of human trafficking in its Commercial Driver's License Manual; and requiring the Administration to provide to an applicant renewing a commercial driver's license certain information from the Manual; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0146
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1462 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/13/2018
Legislative Date
11/13/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2019
Legislative Date
1/17/2019
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {660514/1 Adopted
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2019
Legislative Date
2/20/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/13/2018 11/13/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
House 1/17/2019 1/17/2019 Hearing 1/30 at 2:30 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Favorable with Amendments {660514/1 Adopted 31
House 2/20/2019 2/20/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 31
Text - Third - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Recognition, Prevention, and Reporting of Human Trafficking
House 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 33
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Referred Judicial Proceedings 33
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   16-807.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM