Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from placing or inscribing an item or a symbol, including an actual or depicted noose or swastika, whether temporary or permanent, on any real or personal property, public or private, without the express permission of the owner, owner's agent, or lawful occupant of the property, with the intent to threaten or intimidate any person or group of persons; and establishing that a penalty of imprisonment not exceeding 3 years or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both applies to a violation of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0161
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0004 Session: 2019 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/11/2019
Legislative Date
10/11/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/07/2020
Legislative Date
1/07/2020
Action
Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/11/2019 10/11/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Judiciary
Text - First - Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
House 1/07/2020 1/07/2020 Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM