Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Improper Prescription of Controlled Dangerous Substance Resulting in Death
Sponsored by
Delegate K. Young
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an authorized provider from prescribing, administering, distributing, or dispensing a controlled dangerous substance to a person if such practice is not in conformity with specified provisions of law and the standards of the authorized provider's profession relating to controlled dangerous substances and the person's use or ingestion of the controlled dangerous substance is a contributing cause of the person's death; establishing penalties of up to 20 years in prison or a fine of up to $100,000 or both; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/03/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/06/2016
Legislative Date
1/06/2016
Action
Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/15/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/03/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/06/2016 1/06/2016 Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/12/2016 2/15/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-902.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM