Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sponsored by
Delegates Krebs, M. Jackson, and Hill
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring telephone companies and commercial mobile radio service (CMRS) providers to keep records of 9-1-1 fees collected and remitted for at least four years after the fees are remitted; requiring the Comptroller, in consultation with the Emergency Number Systems Board, to adopt procedures for auditing surcharge collection and remittance by telephones companies and CMRS providers; providing the Comptroller is entitled to .5% of the fees to cover the expense of conducting audits; authorizing the Comptroller to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Committees
Committee Testimony
Details
Emergency Bill
Cross-filed with: SB0061
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
10/28/2019
Legislative Date
10/28/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2020
Legislative Date
1/14/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Adopted
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/11/2020
Legislative Date
2/11/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
25
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2020
Legislative Date
2/13/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-0)
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2020
Legislative Date
2/14/2020
Action
Referred Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/16/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/11/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2020
Legislative Date
5/08/2020
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 10/28/2019 10/28/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
House 1/14/2020 1/14/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Favorable with Amendments {486381/1 Adopted 25
House 2/11/2020 2/11/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 25
Text - Third - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
House 2/13/2020 2/13/2020 Third Reading Passed (132-0) 27
Senate 2/14/2020 2/14/2020 Referred Budget and Taxation 28
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/16/2020 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2020 3/11/2020 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 50
Senate 3/16/2020 3/12/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/17/2020 3/13/2020 Returned Passed 50
Post Passage 5/08/2020 5/08/2020 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-203 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 1:30 PM