Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
Sponsored by
Delegate Feldmark
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the title of the Executive Director of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation to be the Chief Executive Officer of the Corporation; increasing the membership of the Board of the Maryland Technology Development Corporation from 15 to 19 members; altering certain provisions on the removal of a Board member; altering the quorum requirement for the Board; authorizing the publisher of the Annotated Code of Maryland to make certain changes in a certain manner; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0080
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1002 Session: 2020 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/11/2020
Legislative Date
9/11/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2020 9/11/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/14 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Alterations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/18/2021 5:13 PM