Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Southern Maryland Higher Education Council - Modifications
Sponsored by
Delegate Bohanan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of members on the Southern Maryland Higher Education Council from 12 to 13 by adding a member of the public with extensive knowledge of higher education in Maryland, appointed by the Governor; requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to provide staff for the Council; altering to December 1, 2013, the deadline for the Council to submit a final report; and extending the termination provisions relating to the Council by 1 year.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
9/27/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/22/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
31
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2013
Legislative Date
3/06/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
4/04/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2013
Legislative Date
4/01/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 9/27/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Appropriations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 30
House 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Second Reading Passed 30
House 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 32
Senate 2/22/2013 2/22/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 31
Senate 3/06/2013 3/06/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/03/2013 4/04/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Second Reading Passed 62
Senate 4/05/2013 4/01/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 63
House 4/06/2013 4/01/2013 Returned Passed 65
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM