Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Sponsored by
Delegate Glenn
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim May 25 as Missing Children Day.
Committees
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0539 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/20/2018
Legislative Date
11/20/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/30/2019
Legislative Date
1/30/2019
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/20/2018 11/20/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Health and Government Operations
Text - First - General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Missing Children Day
House 1/30/2019 1/30/2019 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-409, 7-409 through 7-417 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM