Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
Sponsored by
Delegate Luedtke
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding eligibility for a certain credit against the State income tax for certain deer donation expenses to include an individual who hunts and harvests an antlerless deer in Montgomery County and donates the deer carcass to the Montgomery County Deer Donation Program; altering the definition of "qualified expenses" to include costs incurred to hunt, harvest, and transport an antlerless deer for donation to certain venison donation organizations; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2021
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/17/2020
Legislative Date
9/17/2020
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2021
Legislative Date
1/13/2021
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/22/2020
Legislative Date
12/22/2020
Action
Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/17/2020 9/17/2020 Pre-filed
House 1/13/2021 1/13/2021 First Reading Ways and Means
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m.
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing canceled
House 12/22/2020 12/22/2020 Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Venison Donation Expenses - Montgomery County Deer Donation Program
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/11/2021 4:42 PM