Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Uniform Act to Secure the Attendance of Witnesses From Without the State in Criminal Proceedings - News Media Privilege
Sponsored by
Delegate Rosenberg
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a judge from issuing a summons directing a witness to attend and testify in court outside the State if the witness is a specified member of the news media, the record indicates the witness reasonably relied on specified protections when the witness engaged in specified conduct, the judge's findings related to the privileged communications laws of the other state, the likelihood the witness will be directed to disclose the name of a confidential source, and if the disclosure would be contrary to a specified provision of law.
Committees
Original:
Judiciary  
Opposite:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0370 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
7/15/2014
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/05/2015
Legislative Date
1/14/2015
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/13/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/26/2015
Legislative Date
1/26/2015
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {842719/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/24/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/10/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 1/05/2015 7/15/2014 Pre-filed
House 1/05/2015 1/14/2015 First Reading Judiciary
House 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing 1/27 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/13/2015 1/13/2015 Hearing cancelled
House 1/26/2015 1/26/2015 Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/17/2015 3/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Favorable with Amendments {842719/1 Report Adopted 45A
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/16/2015 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 46
Senate 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 47
Senate 3/24/2015 3/24/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/09/2015 4/10/2015 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM