Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles
Sponsored by
Delegate Beidle
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Issues Related to the Use of Self-Driving Vehicles; requiring the Task Force to determine the most effective and appropriate best practices for governing self-driving vehicles based on a review of specified information; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to make specified recommendations; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0126
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0172 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
11/09/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/14/2016
Legislative Date
1/14/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2016
Legislative Date
3/14/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 11/09/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Environment and Transportation
House 1/14/2016 1/14/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing cancelled
House 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 1/28 at 1:30 p.m.
House 3/10/2016 3/14/2016 Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM