Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act
Sponsored by
Delegate Chang
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring riders of amusement attractions to obey the posted rules, warnings, and oral instructions and refrain from acting in a certain manner that may cause or contribute to an injury to the rider or others; requiring riders of amusement attractions or the parent or guardian of certain riders to make certain determinations before riding or attempting to ride an amusement attraction; requiring a rider or the parent or guardian of a rider to submit a written report to the amusement owner about any injury incurred by the rider; etc.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1708 Session: 2018 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
11/08/2018
Legislative Date
11/08/2018
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2019
Legislative Date
1/09/2019
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2019
Legislative Date
1/16/2019
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 11/08/2018 11/08/2018 Pre-filed
House 1/09/2019 1/09/2019 First Reading Economic Matters
Text - First - Business Regulation - Amusement Attractions - Maryland Rider Safety Act
House 1/16/2019 1/16/2019 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
(   3-601 through 3-606 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM
Click to return on the top page