Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
To Governor
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Yard Waste
Sponsored by
Delegate Arentz
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Synopsis
Expanding the Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law to include yard waste; establishing a penalty for a violation of the Act; prohibiting a court from imposing less than the mandatory minimum fine of $50 for a violation of the Act; and requiring a court to order a person found guilty of disposing of yard waste in violation of the Act to remove or render harmless the yard waste or reimburse the State, county, municipal corporation, or bi-county unit for its costs incurred in removing the yard waste.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
7/25/2019
Legislative Date
7/25/2019
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2020
Legislative Date
1/08/2020
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Yard Waste
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/09/2020
Legislative Date
1/09/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 7/25/2019 7/25/2019 Pre-filed
House 1/08/2020 1/08/2020 First Reading Environment and Transportation
Text - First - Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law - Yard Waste
House 1/09/2020 1/09/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 1/19/2020 9:40 AM