Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health - Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading - Posting Requirement and Task Force
Sponsored by
Delegates Hixson, Valderrama, Howard, and Simmons
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a food establishment, beginning March 1, 2014, to display a specified poster relating to food allergies; requiring, on or before January 1, 2014, the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, in consultation with the Restaurant Association of Maryland and Food Allergy Research and Education, to create and make available on its Web site a specified poster; establishing a Task Force to Study Food Allergy Awareness, Food Safety, and Food Service Facility Letter Grading; requiring a report on or before January 1, 2014; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0390
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013, October 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
11/08/2012
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/17/2012
Legislative Date
1/09/2013
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/16/2013
Action
Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2013
Legislative Date
3/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {396581/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2013
Legislative Date
3/17/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2013
Legislative Date
3/18/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/20/2013
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
4/02/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/29/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/17/2012 11/08/2012 Pre-filed
House 12/17/2012 1/09/2013 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 1/16/2013 1/16/2013 Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing cancelled
House 1/17/2013 1/17/2013 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/18/2013 3/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Favorable with Amendments {396581/1 Report Adopted 50
House 3/20/2013 3/17/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
House 3/21/2013 3/18/2013 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/20/2013 First Reading Finance 51
Senate 3/22/2013 3/22/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/01/2013 4/02/2013 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 59
Senate 4/02/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 59
Senate 4/03/2013 3/29/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 60
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 252
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-330.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:26 PM