Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Baltimore County Delegation
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that establish the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County; requiring the annual compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County to be set by the County Executive and the County Council in accordance with specified provisions of the Baltimore County Code; applying the Act to the salary or compensation of the judges of the Orphans' Court for Baltimore County at the beginning of the next following term of office with specified exceptions; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: SB0064
Introduced in a prior session as: HB1180 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
7/16/2015
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/16/2015
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/16/2016
Legislative Date
3/13/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/18/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-0)
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2016
Legislative Date
3/29/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/26/2016
Legislative Date
4/26/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/16/2015 7/16/2015 Pre-filed
House 12/16/2015 1/13/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations
House 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/11/2016 3/15/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 45
House 3/16/2016 3/13/2016 Second Reading Passed 45
House 3/21/2016 3/18/2016 Third Reading Passed (134-0) 50
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings 48A
Senate 3/31/2016 4/04/2016 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 57
Senate 4/01/2016 3/28/2016 Second Reading Passed 57
Senate 4/04/2016 3/29/2016 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 58
House 4/05/2016 3/29/2016 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 4/26/2016 4/26/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 245
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM