Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
Sponsored by
Delegate Walker
Status
In the House - Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Director of the State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency, at the end of each fiscal year, to remit money in the unclaimed prize fund to the Comptroller for distribution to each county board of education in the State on a pro rata basis determined by the total lottery sales made in each county; requiring that a county board of education use distributions from the fund for public prekindergarten programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Ways and Means  
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
9/11/2017
Legislative Date
9/11/2017
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/10/2018
Legislative Date
1/10/2018
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/03/2018
Legislative Date
1/03/2018
Action
Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 9/11/2017 9/11/2017 Pre-filed
House 1/10/2018 1/10/2018 First Reading Ways and Means
Text - First - State Lottery - Unclaimed Prizes - Public Prekindergarten Programs
House 1/03/2018 1/03/2018 Hearing 1/17 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM