Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Bay Restoration Fund - Authorized Uses
Sponsored by
Chair, Environmental Matters Committee (By Request - Departmental - Environment)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing specified fee revenue collected for the Bay Restoration Fund to pay specified debt issued by a local government for the cost of connecting properties served by on-site sewage disposal systems to specified existing municipal wastewater facilities under specified circumstances; altering conditions for the funding of specified costs; requiring the Department of the Environment to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Pre-Filed
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
By Request of the Governor
History
Legislation History
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
10/10/2013
Action
Pre-filed
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
12/19/2013
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/08/2014
Legislative Date
1/08/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {970117/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/11/2014
Legislative Date
3/08/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2014
Legislative Date
3/09/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {704832/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {923729/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
House Concur - Senate Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (134-1)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/08/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
House 12/19/2013 10/10/2013 Pre-filed
House 12/19/2013 1/08/2014 First Reading Environmental Matters
House 1/08/2014 1/08/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing cancelled
House 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/29 at 2:00 p.m.
House 3/07/2014 3/10/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Favorable with Amendments {970117/1 Report Adopted 44
House 3/11/2014 3/08/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
House 3/12/2014 3/09/2014 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 45
Senate 3/13/2014 3/10/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 44
Senate 3/13/2014 3/13/2014 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {704832/1 Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Conway) {923729/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) 48
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 House Concur - Senate Amendments 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (134-1) 61
House 4/01/2014 3/25/2014 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 4/08/2014 4/08/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 80
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1605.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM